Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH NUCLEAR MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 277902
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2013 Not submitted
Annual return 31 December 2012 10 May 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2012 10 May 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2011 10 July 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2011 10 July 2012 On Time
Annual return 31 December 2010 20 July 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2010 20 July 2011 On Time