Financial history THE BRITISH NUCLEAR MEDICINE SOCIETY

Charity Number: 277902
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2008 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/12/2011 31/12/2012
Total gross income £334.93k £320.88k £305.57k £262.90k £297.67k
Total expenditure £419.56k £329.61k £239.54k £250.57k £268.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A