WINDMILL GATEWAY CLUB

Charity number: 277903
Charity reporting is overdue by 1759 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

windmill gateway club operates to provide youth club acivities for young people with special needs in a safe environment

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2015

Total income: £3,000
Total expenditure: £1,800

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Lambeth

Governance

Registration history:
  • 09 July 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LOLITA BARTLETT Trustee
None on record
LISA TRIM Trustee
None on record
JUSTINE MCKAY BAYO Trustee
None on record
JUNE STILLMAN Trustee
None on record
IRENE JUNE TRIM Trustee
None on record
LOUISE YING Trustee
None on record
MR TERRY TRIM Trustee
None on record
ANN GRAY Trustee
None on record
ALAN GRIEFF Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2006 30/09/2007 30/09/2014 30/09/2015
Total gross income £11.49k £16.84k £14.18k £3.00k
Total expenditure £22.97k £19.94k £14.95k £1.80k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 298 days
Annual return 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 664 days
Annual return 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1029 days
Annual return 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1394 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1394 days
Annual return 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1759 days
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1759 days
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 CAMBRAY ROAD
LONDON
SW12 0DX
Phone:
02086752766
Website:

No information available