Financial history HARLINGTON VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity number: 277913
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £14.19k £12.03k £19.62k £13.71k £19.49k
Total expenditure £13.22k £14.19k £11.67k £16.47k £24.22k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k £8.00k N/A N/A