Accounts and annual returns THE BRITISH FRIENDS OF THE DIASPORA YESHIVA TORAS YISRAEL TRUST

Charity Number: 277919
Charity reporting is up to date (120 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 28 February 2025 120 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 November 2021 30 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 24 November 2020 24 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required