THE NICHOLAS CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 277923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

THIS SMALL CHARITY GIVES DONATIONS ON BEHALF OF THE DUKE AND DUCHESS OF KENT, MOSTLY TO THE CHARITABLE ORGANISATIONS WITH WHICH THEY ARE CONNECTED

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £5,335
Total expenditure: £2,524

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 November 1979: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
NICHOLAS MARDEN Chair 23 August 2011
THE PLANTERS' BENEVOLENT FUND OF CEYLON
Received: On time
Nicholas Turnbull Trustee 01 December 2018
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.54k £3.87k £3.23k £3.78k £5.34k
Total expenditure £3.47k £2.57k £2.74k £2.51k £2.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 31 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 15 November 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 16 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 13 November 2020 13 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
OFFICE OF HRH THE DUKE OF KENT
ST. JAMES PALACE
LONDON
SW1A 1BQ
Phone:
02079304872
Website:

No information available