THE HEAD AND NECK CANCER RESEARCH TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Research into head and neck cancers, development of treatment, funding of research staff, provision of research facilities and education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 June 1979: Standard registration
- 20 June 2013: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 20 June 2013: Funds transferred to 1142037 Oracle Head and Neck Cancer UK Limited
- H & NCRT (Working name)
- HEAD & NECK CANCER RESEARCH TRUST (Working name)
- ORACLE CANCER TRUST (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2007 | 05/04/2008 | 05/04/2009 | 05/04/2010 | 31/05/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £208.11k | £298.02k | £452.86k | £111.00k | £218.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £196.97k | £184.94k | £575.20k | £343.50k | £914.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2011 | 16 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2011 | 22 March 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2010 | 02 September 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2010 | 04 February 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1ST MARCH 1979 AND AMENDED 12TH OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
RESEARCH INTO ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH OR BEARING ON THE CAUSES PREVENTION TREATMENT AND CURE OF CANCER TO INCLUDE RESEARCH INTO AND TO ADVACE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SURGERY AS APPLIED TO CANCER OF THE HEAD AND NECK, AND FOR THE PUBLICATION AND DISSEMINATION OF THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCHES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window