THE SOCIETY OF FRIENDS OF WOODCHURCH WINDMILL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain in working condition an old windmill at woodchurch for the benefit of the community and visitors. It is also a valuable educational facility inso far as many groups of youngsters visit the windmill to learn about traditional rural industries and the importance of environmental issues.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 06 July 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK SPAIN | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID BULL | Trustee | 15 May 2013 |
|
|
||||
MEL BAILEY | Trustee | 14 April 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £149 | £122 | £148 | £1.43k | £132 | |
|
Total expenditure | £449 | £123 | £145 | £137 | £185 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 06 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2024 | 311 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 20TH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PERMANENT PRESERVATION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC GENERALLY AND ESPECIALLY THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF WOODCHURCH IN THE COUNTY OF KENT OF THE WOODCHURCH WINDMILL (OR IF IT SHOULD BE DESTROYED, OF OTHER BUILDINGS OF HISTORIC INTEREST OR BEAUTY OR LANDS OF ECOLOGICAL VALUE OR OTHER SICENTICFIC IMPORTANCE WITHIN THE SAID PARISH) AND GENERALLY TO PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE CHARACTER AND AMENITIES OF THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH WOODCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
132b Front Road
Woodchurch
Ashford
TN26 3SH
- Phone:
- 01233861144
- Email:
- woodchurchwindmill@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window