THE ROYAL SOCIETY OF BIOLOGY

Charity Number: 277981
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Royal Society of Biology is a single unified voice for biology: advising Government and influencing policy; advancing education and professional development; supporting our members, and engaging and encouraging public interest in the life sciences.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 04 July 1979: Standard registration
  • 26 June 2012: Funds received from 1081346 HEADS OF UNIVERSITY BIOLOGICAL SCIENCES (HUBS)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • THE INSTITUTE OF BIOLOGY (Working name)
  • INSTITUTE OF BIOLOGY (Previous name)
  • THE SOCIETY OF BIOLOGY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

15 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Professor Sir Ian Boyd Chair 18 May 2022
None on record
Professor Jeremy Pritchard Trustee 30 October 2024
None on record
Alastair Land Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Dr Helen Watson Trustee 08 May 2024
None on record
Professor Dame Melanie Welham Trustee 01 September 2023
JOHN INNES FOUNDATION
Received: On time
Neil Burton Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Professor Sara Louise Cosby Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Lucy Hudson Trustee 19 May 2021
None on record
Professor Stefan Przyborski FRSB Trustee 06 May 2020
None on record
Dr Suzy Clare Moody MRSB Trustee 21 May 2019
None on record
Dr Jacqui Piner Trustee 15 May 2019
None on record
PROF PATRICIA KUWABARA Trustee 02 May 2018
None on record
Professor Claire Wathes Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
Professor Hilary MacQueen Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record
Dr Louise Leong Trustee 10 May 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £2.62m £2.75m £2.79m £2.77m £2.77m
Total expenditure £3.12m £3.00m £2.48m £2.74m £3.07m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £189.00k £310.00k £357.00k £255.00k £180.00k
Income - Other trading activities £94.00k £0 £40.00k £56.00k £71.00k
Income - Charitable activities £2.34m £2.32m £2.36m £2.41m £2.46m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.00k £33.00k £32.00k £46.00k £51.00k
Income - Other £0 £82.00k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £85.00k £228.00k £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.06m £2.95m £2.44m £2.69m £3.03m
Expenditure - Raising funds £62.00k £50.00k £40.00k £46.00k £48.00k
Expenditure - Governance £23.00k £47.00k £23.00k £71.00k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £189.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Own use assets £195.00k £206.00k £201.00k £168.00k £129.00k
Long-term investments £639.00k £1.01m £1.35m £1.42m £1.44m
Other assets £1.62m £1.27m £1.16m £1.08m £841.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £486.00k £702.00k £452.00k £492.00k £586.00k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2023 15 May 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2023 15 May 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2022 18 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 18 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2021 26 August 2022 27 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 26 August 2022 27 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 21 May 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 September 2019 08 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 08 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Royal Society Biology
1 Naoroji Street
LONDON
WC1X 0GB
Phone:
020 3925 3440