THE TAUNTON OPPORTUNITY GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Established in 1972, Taunton Opportunity Group is a specialist provision for preschool children with special educational needs and/or disabilities living in Taunton and its surrounding areas. It is our mission to help children achieve their full potential through providing a tailored curriculum which offers developmentally appropriate, inclusive and stimulating learning and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023
Total income includes £56,622 from 1 government contract(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Somerset
Governance
- TOG (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Holly Emma Burchett | Chair | 23 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosi Rosthorn | Trustee | 18 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jenna Whittet-Evens | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Sian Small | Trustee | 20 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Gavin James Brown | Trustee | 08 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alison Mary Brown | Trustee | 23 November 2017 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.85k | £74.90k | £103.31k | £77.24k | £79.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.96k | £82.68k | £76.79k | £94.00k | £97.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £52.89k | N/A | N/A | £61.75k | £56.62k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.37k | £10.00k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 March 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 17 February 2022 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 183 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 August 2021 | 183 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | 20 December 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31/07/1972 AS AMENDED ON 27/03/2000 AS AMENDED ON 20/11/2013 as amended on 08 Nov 2018
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE SAFE AND SATISFYING GROUP EXPERIENCE AND PLAY FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS AND OTHER CHILDREN UNDER STATUTORY SCHOOL AGE.
Area of benefit
THE DISTRICT OF TAUNTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Taunton Opportunity Group
Crowcombe Road
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA2 7NF
- Phone:
- 01823284550
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window