THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE STUDENTS' ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF JOHN RICHARD C KENYON C.S.B.

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Holding annual teaching and refresher sessions for the pupils of J Richard C Kenyon CSB ---which nurture and advance members' practice of Christian Science spiritual healing in their local and global communities, and which teach and encourage members to serve the public as Christian Science practitioners (healers), a core aspect of the activities of the Church of Christ, Scientist, worldwide.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 10 July 1979: Standard registration
- THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE ASSOCIATION OF THE PUPILS OF JOHN RICHARD C KENYON (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Alan Grotefendt | Chair | 14 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOHN FENWICK LUKE | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|||||
John Hood | Trustee | 08 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.86k | £3.84k | £4.39k | £455 | £1.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.40k | £5.58k | £2.50k | £4.09k | £2.18k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 April 2024 | 170 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 934 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 April 2024 | 900 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 March 2021 | 148 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF VARIATION DATED 18 SEPTEMBER 1996.
Charitable objects
A. PROMOTING AND EXTENDING THE RELIGION OF CHRISTIAN SCIENCE AS TAUGHT BY MARY BAKER EDDY IN THE CHRISTIAN SCIENCE TEXTBOOK "SCIENCE AND HEALTH WITH KEY TO THE SCRIPTURES". B. SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT AND WHICH ARE SUPPORTIVE OF AND CONSISTENT WITH THE TEACHINGS AND PRACTICE OF THE SAID RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Holt Close
Leeds
LS16 8DJ
- Phone:
- 01132672200
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window