Accounts and annual returns NORTH TONBRIDGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 278053
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2019 04 June 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2018 21 August 2018 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2018 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2017 04 September 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2017 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2016 06 January 2017 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2016 Not Required