Financial history NORTH TONBRIDGE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity number: 278053
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2015 31/03/2016 31/03/2017 31/03/2018 31/03/2019
Total gross income £4.08k £4.27k £4.71k £6.57k £2.03k
Total expenditure £4.44k £4.85k £4.05k £3.91k £2.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A