EUROPEAN OUTREACH TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary object of the charity is the advancement of the Christian faith, which it does through the Sword of the Spirit, an international network of ecumenical Christian communities. These communities engage in pastoral and evangelistic work, in the provision of public worship, and in cooperating with one another in pursuing their compatible aims.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Ealing
- Australia
- Belgium
- Germany
- Ireland
- Lebanon
- New Zealand
- Northern Ireland
- Poland
- Scotland
- Tanzania
- United States
Governance
- 10 July 1979: Standard registration
- HARAMBEE (Working name)
- KAIROS (Working name)
- SWORD OF THE SPIRIT (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JEAN BARBARA | Chair | 30 November 1997 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW PETTMAN | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|||||
Antoine Laureys | Trustee | 21 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
DESMOND DICK | Trustee | 02 June 1992 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £475.84k | £446.68k | £451.07k | £478.94k | £463.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £651.75k | £399.17k | £365.34k | £483.29k | £401.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 23RD APRIL 1979 as amended on 27 May 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
31 LYNTON ROAD
LONDON
W3 9HL
- Phone:
- 02089927170
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window