Governing document GINGERBREAD CORNER

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 31 MAY 1979 AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 1 MARCH 1991 AND 12 NOVEMBER 1992 AND 30 JULY 2008 as amended on 21 Dec 2018
Charitable objects
The objects of the Charity are, for the public benefit, to: a) improve the social and economic circumstances of disadvantaged families; b) preserve, protect and improve the good health (mental, emotional and physical) of children and their parents; and c) prevent and relieve the suffering of children who have been the subject of cruelty and maltreatment.
Area of benefit
IN PRACTICE LONDON BOROUGH OF CROYDON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.