SIKH SANGAT, LONDON EAST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide education to members, organise language and music classes, seminars on religious, social and cultural issues, support women, youth and the elderly. Help members research on religious issues, provide Kirtan and Gurbani experience, help the needy in all respects, celebrate social and religious festival including all Gurpurab's. Create Sikhism awareness by arranging worship and lectures.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
75 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 July 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Piara Singh Kalsi | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Satvinder Singh Rattan | Trustee | 30 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mohinder Kaur Johal | Trustee | 02 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Amarjit Singh Rattan | Trustee | 05 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £96.97k | £73.53k | £80.76k | £100.77k | £102.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.59k | £55.71k | £67.16k | £77.68k | £94.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 03 March 2025 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 22 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
30 April 2021
(These accounts |
28 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3RD JUNE 1979, AS AMENDED ON 11 MARCH 1984 AND 25 APRIL 1999, AS AMENDED ON 19TH JUNE 2005 as amended on 02 Apr 2017 as amended on 31 Mar 2019
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE SIKH RELIGION, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Sikh Sangat London East
Sikh Temple
69-71 Francis Road
LONDON
E10 6PN
- Phone:
- 07449316395
- Email:
- Info@leytongurdwara.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window