FOXHILL/COMBE DOWN COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To care for and promote the use of the community centre for the benefit of all members of the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2010
People

2 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bath And North East Somerset
Governance
- 20 August 1979: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR DAVID CARR | Trustee | 25 May 2011 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Ladd | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2004 | 31/05/2005 | 31/05/2006 | 31/05/2009 | 31/05/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.19k | £13.76k | £14.43k | £10.42k | £10.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.30k | £11.26k | £10.16k | £12.94k | £12.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 59 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 424 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 790 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1155 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1520 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 1520 days |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19TH FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF FOXHILL/COMBEDOWN AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. B) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE.
Area of benefit
FOXHILL/COMBE DOWN
Contact information
- Address:
-
2B COMBE ROAD
BATH
BA2 5HX
- Phone:
- 01225837687
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window