LIONS CLUB OF VENTNOR CHARITY ACCOUNT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give assistance to those in need, where possible.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Animals
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Isle Of Wight
Governance
- 23 July 1979: Standard registration
- LIONS CLUB OF VENTNOR (Working name)
- ISLE OF WIGHT (VENTNOR) LIONS CLUB CHARITY TRUST FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Julia Lock | Trustee | 01 October 2019 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL CHARLES PATCH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £520 | £0 | £1.84k | £276 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £498 | £50 | £667 | £1.06k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 21 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 26TH FEBRUARY 1979
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSE OF PURPOSES ACCORDING TO THE LAWS OF ENGLAND AND WALES IN AND WITHIN THE AREA, COMPRISING THE TERRITORIAL AREA OF THE CLUB THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THE REPUBLIC OF EIRE OR ELSEWHERE AS THE CLUB SHALL IN ITS ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE AND SELECT.
Area of benefit
UK. REPUBLIC OF EIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 WESTVIEW COTTAGES
CHALE STREET
CHALE
VENTNOR
PO38 2HF
- Phone:
- 01983551361
- Email:
- julialock@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window