Financial history LONDON SPORTS CLUB FOR THE BLIND

Charity number: 278133
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £10.56k £14.64k £6.87k £4.97k £8.62k
Total expenditure £6.97k £16.45k £2.85k £2.05k £4.45k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A