THE WINCHELSEA BEACH COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
the objects of the charity are to manage and maintain the community hall for the benefit of the residents of the village of winchelsea beach as defined by rother district council and icklesham parish council;and provide facilities for social and educational activities,and enhance the quality of life of the said residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,725 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Sussex
Governance
- 10 August 1979: Standard registration
- WBCA (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Geoff Foot | Chair | 01 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Noelle Beerling | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Madeline Parker | Trustee | 20 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Natalie Eldridge | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jacky Barker | Trustee | 27 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Radford | Trustee | 14 December 2015 |
|
|
||||
JILL ELIZABETH FIRMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MICHAEL FIRMAN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID CHRISTOPHER WATERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LYNNE SUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.28k | £16.84k | £24.99k | £27.23k | £10.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.45k | £4.74k | £10.47k | £10.59k | £10.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £3.71k | £13.45k | £20.82k | £17.67k | £1.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 13 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 13 December 2021 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 11TH APRIL 1973 AS AMENDED ON 13TH MARCH 1990 AND ON 17 MARCH 1999 AS AMENDED ON 16 APR 2016 AS AMENDED ON 29 JUL 2021 as amended on 30 Mar 2022
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE VILLAGE OF WINCHELSEA BEACH AS DEFINED BY ROTHER DISTRICT AND ICKLESHAM PARISH COUNCILS WITHOUT DISTINCTION ON ANY PERSONAL, POLITICAL, RACIAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER GROUNDS; LIKEWISE TO PROVIDE FACILITIES TO PROMOTE SOCIAL WELFARE BY WAY OF EDUCATIONAL, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATIONS WITH THE OBJECT OF ENHANCING THE QUALITY OF LIFE SAID RESIDENTS. (B) TO CONTINUE TO SECURE THE EXISTENCE OF THE ESTABLISHED COMMUNITY HALL (HEREINAFTER CALL "THE HALL") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAID HALL IN ORDER THAT IT MAY BE USED FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED AND/OR APPROVED BY THE ASSOCIATION AND ITS SECTIONS AND PARTICIPATING CONSTITUENT BODIES IN THE FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL BE NON-POLITICAL AND NON-SECTARIAN. THE ASSOCIATION SHALL HAVE THE POWER TO AFFILIATE TO OTHER ORGANISATIONS WITH SIMILAR CHARITABLE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
THE VILLAGE OF WINCHELSEA BEACH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Smeatons Harbour
Dogs Hill Road
Winchelsea Beach
Winchelsea
TN36 4LX
- Phone:
- 01797222379
- Email:
- wbcahall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
winchelseabeachcommunityassociation.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window