THE GOLDBLATT FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting individuals and organisations re Jewish learning and charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 08 August 1979: Standard registration
- 21 June 2023: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.63k | £22.15k | £10.60k | £19.51k | £10.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.00k | £17.45k | £11.12k | £20.42k | £11.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28TH MARCH 1979
Charitable objects
ADVANCEMENT AND PROVISION OF JEWISH RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH ORTHODOX TENETS OF THE JEWISH RELIGION IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT. (FOR FURTHER DETAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 OF TRUST DEED).
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window