THE ARMY CADET LEAGUE - MIDDLESEX NORTH WEST SECTOR, GREATER LONDON ACF BRANCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General Charitable Purpose Children/young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout London
Governance
- 30 July 1979: Standard registration
- 17 March 1995: Removed
No other names
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michael Guy Adrian DRAGE OBE | Chair | 20 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Colonel Gary Philip LANGLEY JP | Trustee | 10 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Major Janet Christine COLLETT | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John WALTON BSc FRICS | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|||||
WO Samuel David BELASCO | Trustee | 25 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lieutenant Colonel Christopher Donald WESTERN | Trustee | 21 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Martin Henry Charles RUSSELL MBE DL | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Major Stephen Bryan Turner | Trustee | 11 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Timothy Paul Connolly | Trustee | 04 September 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.01k | £4.57k | £7.47k | £9.73k | £9.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £537 | £1.85k | £2.00k | £9.49k | £9.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED MARCH 1979 AND AMENDED 4TH JUNE 1979 AND 14TH MARCH 1983 as amended on 20 Mar 2023
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE INTEREST IN THE ARMY CADET FORCE AMONG CITIZENS, INDUSTRY AND COMMERCE. 3.2 TO COLLECT AND RECEIVE ALL FUNDS GIVEN BY VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION, GIFTS, LEGACIES, DONATIONS, ENDOWMENT'S AND FUND RAISING ACTIVITIES. 3.3 TO MAKE GRANTS FROM THE INCOME AND TO CARRY ON SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE CADETS AND THE CADET FORCE ADULT VOLUNTEERS OF THE MIDDLESEX AND NORTH WEST SECTOR, GREATER LONDON ARMY CADET FORCE ("THE SECTOR"); AND WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING TO SUPPORT THE SECTOR TO PROVIDE ACTIVITIES FOR YOUNG PEOPLE WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- 30 July 1979 : Standard registration
- 17 March 1995 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
Castle Loma, Mill Lane,
Horndon on the Hill,
Essex
SS17 8LU
- Phone:
- 07871 049039
- Email:
- cadetleague@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window