BATHGATE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Support of other charities
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cheshire East
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Wirral
Governance
- 15 October 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COMMODORE WALKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
MRS ANN WALKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BENNETT ACMA CGMA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40.00k | £35.00k | £140.00k | £145.00k | £170.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.50k | £0 | £128.00k | £156.65k | £163.20k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 24 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 21 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 19 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 15 August 2021 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 11 January 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 1ST JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
TO CARRY OUT LEGALLY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OR SUFFERING OR THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OR RELIGION,AND TO SUPPORT THE WORK AND OBJECTS OF ANY OTHER CHARITY REGISTERED BY THE CHARITY COMMISSION AS THE TRUSTEES BEING NOT LESS THAN THREE IN NUMBER SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME BY DEED EXECUTED WITH THEIR UNANIMOUS CONSENT DECLARE.PROVIDED THAT THE SAID CHARITABLE OBJECTS SHALL BE LIMITED TO OBJECTS RESIDENT AND SITUATE IN THE UNITED KINGDON OF GREAT BRITAIN.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Contact information
- Address:
-
BATHGATE CHARITABLE TRUST
ARCLID QUARRY
CONGLETON ROAD
ARCLID
SANDBACH
CHESHIRE
- Phone:
- 01270762444
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window