BERKHAMSTED TOWN HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide community facilities for the people of Berkhamsted and surrounding area
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income includes £500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 07 December 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PETER NORMAN ELSWORTH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sally Symington | Trustee | 28 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD JOHN CASE | Trustee | 29 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jim Jukes | Trustee | 26 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Cowie | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
John Gerry | Trustee | 20 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
GILES NOEL CLARK | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN REAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IAIN LANG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER TALBOT-PONSONBY | Trustee |
|
||||||
JEANNIE STIRRUP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.97k | £191.11k | £181.31k | £179.48k | £192.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £178.74k | £153.19k | £166.98k | £186.20k | £206.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £42.31k | £6.00k | N/A | £500 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 20 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 18 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 03 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 12 FEBRUARY 1981
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
TOWN OF BERKHAMSTEAD AND THE PARISH OF NORTHCHURCH
Contact information
- Address:
-
Berkhamsted Town Hall Trust
196 High Street
BERKHAMSTED
BERKHAMSTED
Hertfordshire
HP4 3AP
- Phone:
- 01442862288
- Email:
- bthtmanager@tiscali.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window