THE INTERNATIONAL EQUINE REPRODUCTION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises International Symposium on Equine Reproduction
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 16 August 1979: Standard registration
- IER TRUST (Working name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James Crabtree | Trustee | 01 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN DUGDALE MA Vet MB | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr AMANDA MARJORIE de MESTRE BVSc PhD | Trustee | 09 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD ERIC STANLEY GREENWOOD MA VETMB | Trustee |
|
||||||
PROFESSOR TOM ARJUN EDGAR STOUT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.32k | £2.24k | £2.62k | £117.71k | £64.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.00k | £19.13k | £18.70k | £32.39k | £117.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | 30 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 18 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 21 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30TH JUNE 1979
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION CONCERNING ANIMAL REPRODUCTION OF ALL KINGS AND IN PARTICULAR THE REPRODUCTION OF UNGULATES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Widmerpool Lane
Willoughby On The Wolds
LOUGHBOROUGH
Leicestershire
LE12 6TE
- Phone:
- 07778502510
- Email:
- juliakydd@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window