WRITTLE (EVENING) - WOMEN'S INSTITUTE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We hold monthly meetings for members of our Women's Institute. We listen to speakers and read out minutes, etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
Governance
- 21 August 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Bolton | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Savage | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Clarke | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Spencer | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Saltmarsh | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Pavitt | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Farren-Brown | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE THOMAS | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS HEATHER AWCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.32k | £1.96k | £3.18k | £6.27k | £6.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.94k | £1.20k | £3.57k | £6.03k | £6.22k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 14 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MODEL CONSTITUTION AND RULES
Charitable objects
TO IMPROVE AN DEVELOP CONDITIONS OF RURAL LIFE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CONSTUTUTION AND RULES OF THE WOMEN'S INSTITUTE.
Area of benefit
WRITTLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Tower Avenue
CHELMSFORD
CM1 2PW
- Phone:
- 01245256245
- Email:
- grthomas1@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window