Trustees WRITTLE (EVENING) - WOMEN'S INSTITUTE
Charity number: 278302

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Bolton | Trustee | 15 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Debbie Savage | Trustee | 01 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Clarke | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Helen Spencer | Trustee | 01 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
Maxine Saltmarsh | Trustee | 12 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Pavitt | Trustee | 08 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Farren-Brown | Trustee | 08 April 2015 |
|
|
||||
Anne Williams | Trustee | 01 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
JANE THOMAS | Trustee | 12 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
MAVIS HEATHER AWCOCK | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.