MRS PILKINGTON'S CHARITABLE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Prevent cruelty to equine animals, to relieve suffering and distress among such equine animals and to care for an protect such equines in need of care and protection. Also, to provide social services and help for the relief of aged.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Animals
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 September 1979: Standard registration
- 08 March 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 08 March 2017: Funds transferred to 1170847 ELISE PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST
- ELISE PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- MRS ELISE PILKINGTON CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2012 | 05/04/2013 | 05/04/2014 | 05/04/2015 | 05/04/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £89.56k | £87.34k | £79.86k | £89.51k | £94.25k | |
|
Total expenditure | £183.83k | £188.20k | £217.90k | £200.94k | £203.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 28 February 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2017 | 20 October 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2016 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2016 | 14 September 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2015 | 13 October 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2015 | 13 October 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2014 | 01 July 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2014 | 01 July 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 05 April 2013 | 20 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2013 | 20 November 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SETTLEMENT DATED 22ND JULY 1979
Charitable objects
(A) TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO EQUINE ANIMALS TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS AMONG SUCH EQUINE ANIMALS TO CARE FOR AND PROTECT SUCH EQUINE ANIMALS INCLUDING LIVE HORSES BEING TRANSPORTED COUNTRY TO COUNTRY FOR BUTCHERY IF SUCH ANIMALS ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND PROTECTION BY REASON OF SIKNESS MALTREATMENT POOR CIRCUMSTANCES OR OTHER SIMILAR CAUSES. (B) TO PROVIDE SOCIAL SERVICES AND HELP FOR THE RELIEF OF THE AGED INFIRM OR POOR. (C) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEE S SHALL IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window