Financial history SOCIETY OF ENVIRONMENTAL ENGINEERS

Charity Number: 278338
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2014 31/12/2015 31/12/2016 31/12/2017 31/12/2018
Total gross income £113.67k £114.55k £126.94k £114.12k £97.57k
Total expenditure £110.66k £148.50k £146.86k £117.75k £140.20k
Income from government contracts N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants N/A £0 £0 £0 N/A