GROSVENOR LODGE NO 1257 BENEVOLENT FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Raise money for worthy charity's
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2009
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 09 September 1979: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £486 | £4.19k | £232 | £232 | £4.29k | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £600 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 16 July 2010 | 166 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 26 October 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 2ND MARCH 1971
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF SUCH POOR AND DISTRESSED WIDOWS AND CHILDREN OR TO OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF SUCH MASONIC CHARITIES OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS SOCIETIES AND OBJECTS AS THE LODGE SHALL IN DULY CONSTITUTED MEETING FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT. PROVIDED THAT THE CAPITAL FOR THE SAID CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND THE APPLICATION OF MONIES TOWARDS ANY MORE OF THE SAID CHARITABLE PURPOSES SHALL BE SUBJECT TO SUCH EXPRESS RESTRICTIONS AND CONDITIONS (IF ANY) AS A DONOR MAY PRESCRIBE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window