TESLAKE LIMITED

Charity number: 278390
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Makes grants to organisations

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024

Total income: £211,979
Total expenditure: £171,576

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 January 1981: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ASHER ANDREW Guttentag Chair
THE BECKER FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
ELANORE LIMITED
Received: On time
DAVID GUTTENTAG Trustee
None on record
PAUL KRAUS Trustee
YEPHESS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
MALKA SEGAL Trustee
MEAD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £172.51k £182.63k £218.64k £205.56k £211.98k
Total expenditure £106.47k £115.94k £155.03k £163.12k £171.58k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 25 February 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 05 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 05 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 13 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 13 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 14 December 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 22 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 22 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 HASLEMERE AVENUE
LONDON
NW4 2PX
Phone:
02084556789
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available