Trustees WESTERN ASSOCIATION OF BALLET SCHOOLS
Charity number: 278406

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Amelia Francesca Wortley | Trustee | 13 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kayla Michelle Bartlett | Trustee | 20 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Ann Hopkins | Trustee | 17 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Heather Lees | Trustee | 17 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Julie Laming | Trustee | 19 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
MELINDA SUE GADD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARY ROSINA PEARL THERESA ANNA DUNESBY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANE FARRELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANNE PATRICIA CARRINGTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LORRAINE SUSAN HALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
NATALIE REBECCA PEARL | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.