Financial history TEKEYAN TRUST

Charity number: 278428
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £76.77k £130.82k £93.05k £2.79k £1.58k
Total expenditure £80.91k £126.13k £96.88k £6.13k £672
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A