Financial history UPPER WIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity Number: 278434
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 03/04/2023 03/04/2024
Total gross income £9.23k £21.87k £7.63k £27.06k £19.40k
Total expenditure £9.46k £12.01k £7.30k £13.69k £46.36k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A £21.90k £5.29k