NORWICH CHAMBER MUSIC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The club promotes professional music recitals and concerts and other related activities. It promotes educational projects with professional musicians for schoolchildren and young adults in Norfolk and Norwich.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Norfolk
Governance
- 17 September 1979: Standard registration
- NCM (Working name)
- NORFOLK & NORWICH CHAMBER MUSIC (Previous name)
- NORFOLK AND NORWICH MUSIC CLUB (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christine Campbell DELVIN | Chair | 01 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Josephine Curry | Trustee | 01 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Matthew Gent | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Juliet Rickard | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Jill Christine Halliday | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr John James Harris-Hall | Trustee | 25 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Orton | Trustee | 04 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
CLARA ELIZABETH CROCKATT | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
YARASLAVA KHIMYAK | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA ANNA DONAT | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Helen Colyer | Trustee | 14 September 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £79.20k | £45.85k | £45.85k | £70.69k | £79.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £95.39k | £42.34k | £42.34k | £93.37k | £95.12k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 08 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 13 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 04 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 03/06/1978 AS AMENDED ON 03/09/2003 AS AMENDED ON 07/09/2013 AS AMENDED ON 09 OCT 2019 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAY 2020
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN MUSICAL KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION BY@ THE PROMOTION OF PROFESSIONAL MUSIC RECITALS AND CONCERTS, AND OTHER RELATED ACTIVITIES. THE PROMOTION OF EDUCATIONAL PROJECTS WITH PROFESSIONAL FOR SCHOOL CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS IN NORFOLK AND NORWICH
Area of benefit
NORFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Maltsters
Station Road
Pulham St Mary
Diss
Norfolk
IP21 4QT
- Phone:
- 01379 608452
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window