1ST WOOLSTON (ITCHEN) RANGER UNIT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Woolston Rangers is a Senior Section unit of GirlguidingUK. The unit currently has girls aged 14 to 19 who run their own programme, with the support of their adult leaders. They work on a scheme called Look Wider taking part in activities, giving service to the community and developing their skills across a variety of areas including Independent Living, Enjoying the Out of Doors and Creativity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southampton City
Governance
- 26 September 1979: Standard registration
- 09 June 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- WOOLSTON RANGERS (Working name)
- THE ITCHEN DISTRICT RANGER GUIDE UNIT OF THE GIRL GUIDES ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | 31/08/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £264 | £315 | £629 | £582 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.31k | £634 | £720 | £181 | £541 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 10 May 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2011 | 25 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2011 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 14TH DECEMBER 1922
Charitable objects
THE INSTRUCTION OF GIRLS OF ALL CLASSES IN THE PRINCIPLES OF DISCIPLINE, LOYALTY AND GOOD CITIZENSHIP.
Area of benefit
ITCHEN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window