LYRIC THEATRE HAMMERSMITH LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We produce and present a high quality, accessible programme of contemporary theatre for audiences of all ages and backgrounds from West London and beyond. We also devise and deliver high quality creative learning activities for young people so that they can participate in the arts and develop their personal, social, educational and creative potential.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£6,353,565
Donations and legacies | £1.89m | |
Charitable activities | £3.43m | |
Other trading activities | £969.63k | |
Investments | £69.79k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£7,439,054
Raising funds | £1.06m | |
Charitable activities | £6.38m | |
Other | £0 |
-£3,000 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,389,532 from 4 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.06m | |
Charitable expenditure | £6.38m |
People

103 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
18 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 10 September 1979: Standard registration
- LYRIC HAMMERSMITH (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Whiddington CBE | Trustee | 25 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Shivani Jaswal | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lisa Jayne Popham | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Harbinder Singh Birdi | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Oliver George Mackwood | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nikolaos Souslous | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Nicole Trehy | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Lorraine Heggessey | Trustee | 10 February 2022 |
|
|||||
Lameya Chaudhury | Trustee | 06 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
David Albert Clark Greig | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
JULIE MOLLOY | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Sharkey | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Bora Kwon | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Liz Elston Mayhew | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.07m | £3.64m | £3.96m | £4.90m | £6.35m | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.93m | £2.90m | £4.89m | £6.41m | £7.44m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.36m | £2.57m | £1.79m | £1.35m | £1.39m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.78m | £3.40m | £2.18m | £1.78m | £1.89m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.23m | £118.13k | £495.48k | £852.19k | £969.63k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £3.06m | £118.06k | £1.28m | £2.25m | £3.43m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £7.60k | £2.13k | £2.25k | £28.89k | £69.79k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £5.45m | £2.42m | £4.14m | £5.17m | £6.38m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.48m | £478.33k | £747.87k | £1.24m | £1.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £18.57k | £18.97k | £29.33k | £36.15k | £32.79k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.84m | £8.32m | £7.88m | £7.43m | £6.98m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3 | |
|
Other assets | £2.29m | £3.26m | £3.55m | £3.07m | £3.06m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £925.63k | £624.78k | £1.16m | £1.22m | £1.26m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14TH AUGUST 1979, AMENDED 13TH MARCH 2002 AND 21ST APRIL 2004 as amended on 11 Dec 2024
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR OF PERSONS WHO LIVE OR WORK IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM AND IN THE WEST OF LONDON IN THE ARTS INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE FOREGOING THE ARTS OF DRAMA BALLET MIME DANCE MUSIC SINGING AND OPERA AND FOR SUCH PURPOSE TO ESTABLISH OPERATE AND MANAGE AND ADMINISTER THE LYRIC THEATRE (INCLUDING THE MAIN AUDITORIUM STUDIO THEATRE AND FOYERS THEREOF) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION FOR THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR PERSONS WHO LIVE AND WORK IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM IF SUCH PROVISION IS IN THE INTERESTS OF THEIR SOCIAL WELFARE WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE RECREATIONAL CHARITIES ACT 1958.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF HAMMERSMITH AND FULHAM
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lyric Theatre
Lyric Square
King Street
London
W6 0QL
- Phone:
- 02087416822
- Email:
- enquiries@lyric.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window