CONQUEST ART
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF DISABLED PEOPLE, ASSISTING THEM THROUGH THE ACTIVE PARTICIPATION IN THE VISUAL ARTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Kent
- Suffolk
- Surrey
- Wirral
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 16 September 1979: Standard registration
- 11 September 2017: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 11 September 2017: Funds transferred to 1171582 CONQUEST ART CIO
- CONQUEST ART ENRICHING THE LIVES OF PHYSICALLY DISABLED PEOPLE (Working name)
- CONQUEST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2012 | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.41k | £51.17k | £55.26k | £149.44k | £54.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £58.29k | £52.77k | £49.39k | £52.58k | £60.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2016 | 03 April 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2016 | 03 April 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2015 | 12 April 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2015 | 12 April 2016 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2014 | 14 April 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2013 | 29 April 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2013 | 17 June 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MAY 1979 AS AMENDED ON 10 APRIL 1997 AND 23 SEPTEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
A) THE RELIEF AND REHABILITATION OF THE PHYSICALLY DISABLED AND IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING THEM TO LEAD FULL AND MORE ACTIVE LIVES BY ASSISTING THEM WHEREVER POSSIBLE TO OVERCOME THEIR DISABILITIES. B) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE ARTS FOR THE PHYSICALLY HANDICAPPED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window