Accounts and annual returns OCCOMBE/FAIRWINDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278543
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2012 25 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2011 07 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2010 01 September 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2010 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2009 30 October 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2009 Not Required