Financial history OCCOMBE/FAIRWINDS ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278543
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £3.81k £3.65k £1.85k £3.54k £1.39k
Total expenditure £2.89k £2.58k £2.35k £2.76k £3.54k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A