Accounts and annual returns THE FRATTON COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278546
Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 92 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 December 2024 333 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 29 December 2024 333 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 28 March 2023 56 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 29 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 29 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window