Financial history PADSTOW MUSEUM

Charity number: 278575
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £12.70k £24.27k £11.50k £5.07k £9.34k
Total expenditure £25.89k £16.57k £16.80k £18.16k £16.16k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £1.00k £18.30k £10.67k N/A N/A