THE WALKER 597 TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The object of the charity is achieved by making regular payments and one-off grants to charities which work to promote animal welfare. To ensure our funds are used correctly, we normally consider only UK registered charities, or charities with a UK bank account and contact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 October 1978: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William George Dugmore | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Erica Catherine Dugmore | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicola Helen Stansbie | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|||||
Amanda Burford | Trustee | 11 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Siau-ling Dean | Trustee | 03 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
MR DAVID ANSELL | Trustee | 15 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
JUDITH HELEN MIDDLETON | Trustee | 18 December 2012 |
|
|
||||
MS HELEN ROWETT | Trustee | 16 March 1979 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Hughes | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £49.57k | £39.07k | £36.67k | £38.95k | £51.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £66.81k | £82.71k | £65.04k | £59.49k | £63.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 43 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 20 March 2025 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 03 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 04 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16TH MARCH 1979 as amended on 11 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS TRUSTS AND INSTITUTIONS FOR THE BENEFIT OF ANIMAL WELFARE AND THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANIMALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Fazeley Cottage
Coleshill Street
Fazeley
TAMWORTH
B78 3RQ
- Phone:
- 07715 291288
- Email:
- chair@walker597.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window