Accounts and annual returns THE ARNOLD LODGE CHARITABLE ASSOCIATION FUND

Charity number: 278592
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 30 September 2021 14 July 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2020 24 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2020 Not Required
Annual return 30 September 2019 05 September 2020 37 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 September 2019 Not Required