Financial history HAROLD WOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 278629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £74.28k £75.23k £65.52k £69.31k £72.75k
Total expenditure £32.77k £23.11k £68.03k £34.59k £32.39k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A