REACH - THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILDREN WITH HAND OR ARM DEFICIENCY
Charity number: 278679
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
support for families who have children with upper limb deficiency
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2010
Total income: £79,389
Total expenditure: £84,620
Fundraising
No information available
Trading
No information available
Trustee payments
No information available
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
Registration history:
- 09 October 1979: Standard registration
- 18 August 2011: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 18 August 2011: Funds transferred to 1134544 REACH CHARITY LIMITED
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- REACH - THE ASSOCIATION FOR CHILDREN WITH ARTIFICIAL ARMS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2006 | 31/08/2007 | 31/08/2008 | 31/08/2009 | 31/08/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.48k | £214.37k | £175.81k | £237.35k | £79.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £186.50k | £183.99k | £188.80k | £193.61k | £84.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2010 | 20 July 2011 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2010 | 15 April 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2009 | 07 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2009 | 07 June 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2008 | 08 June 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2008 | 08 June 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 August 2007 | 03 June 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2007 | 11 July 2008 | 11 days late |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15TH SEPTEMBER 1979, AS AMENDED 22 OCTOBER 1988, 30 SEPTEMBER 1989, AND 16TH OCTOBER 1993
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF CHILDREN WITH UPPER LIMB DEFICIENCIES.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window