HOME COUNTIES ASSOCIATION OF SPIRITUAL HEALERS
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Spiritual Healing Association
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 06 November 1979: Standard registration
- 15 February 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2016 | 30/11/2017 | 30/11/2018 | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £844 | £1.34k | £239 | £590 | £2 | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.21k | £703 | £1.24k | £2.72k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 06 October 2021 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | 18 January 2020 | 110 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7TH APRIL 1979 AS AMENDED 13TH APRIL 1991 AND 29 APRIL 1996
Charitable objects
TO SERVE THE PUBLIC BY THE PROMOTION OF THE STUDY AND PRACTICE OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF SPIRITUAL HEALING WHICH MAY BE ADMINISTERED THROUGH PRAYER AND WHERE NECESSARY, THE LAYING ON OF HANDS FOR THE HEALING OF SPIRIT, MIND AND BODIES, AND INCLUDING SUCH ALLIED THERAPIES AS HAVE A SPIRITUAL BASIS.
Area of benefit
HOME COUNTIES
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window