THE MOUNTBATTEN MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting the charitable organisations that Lord Mountbatten was associated with during his latter years. Chief amongst these are technological research and the application of technology to aid handicapped and disabled people, and support for disadvantaged young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 15 October 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THE HONOURABLE MICHAEL JOHN KNATCHBULL | Chair |
|
||||||
Daisy Knatchbull | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
BEN MOORHEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KELLY KNATCHBULL | Trustee |
|
||||||
WILLIAM PHILIP FOX | Trustee |
|
||||||
ASHLEY HICKS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HON PHILIP KNATCHBULL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.39k | £43.97k | £34.05k | £37.34k | £36.95k | |
|
Total expenditure | £32.53k | £29.29k | £37.64k | £32.47k | £41.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 08 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 13 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 09 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 1ST OCTOBER 1979
Charitable objects
TO PAY OR APPLY OR CAUSE TO BE PAID OR APPLIED AT SUCH TIME OR TIMES AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT THE INCOME AND IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL THINK FIT THE CAPITAL OFTHE TRUST FUND IN OR TOWARDS THE SUPPORT OF: (A) ANY ONE OR MORE OF THE CHARITABLE BODIES AND EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH THE LATE ADMIRAL OF THE FLEET THE EARL MOUNTBATTEN OF BURMA WAS DURING HIS LIFETIME ASSOCIATED OR CONCERNED AND (B) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE BODIES OR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
69 Holgate Road
YORK
YO24 4AA
- Phone:
- 01904 619740
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window