OGBOURNE ST GEORGE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides buildings/facilities/open space for general public
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 20 April 1979: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Colin David Jeffery | Chair | 26 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Georgie Bevan | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Char Utton | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mary Quigley | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Caroline Joy Iliffe | Trustee | 29 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Timothy Einar Frost | Trustee | 27 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rev ROGER POWELL | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Louise Marie Procter | Trustee | 02 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
TIMOTHY OLIVER FROST | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.25k | £2.94k | £4.53k | £14.99k | £7.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.95k | £3.85k | £3.93k | £16.56k | £6.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 05 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 04 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
LEASE AND TRUST DEED DATED 14 JUNE 1983.
Charitable objects
A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF HE BENEFICIAL AREA WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS LECTURES AND CLASSES AND OTHER FORM OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF OGBOURNE ST. GEORGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
8 Jubbs Lane
Ogbourne St. George
MARLBOROUGH
Wiltshire
SN8 1SR
- Phone:
- 01672 841485
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window