SIDMOUTH ANIMAL WELFARE SOCIETY AND ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Animal Welfare and Re-homing Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
- Dorset
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 October 1979: Standard registration
- A R C (Working name)
- ARC ANIMAL RESCUE CENTRE (Working name)
- SIDMOUTH AND DISTRICT ANIMAL WELFARE AND ANIMAL RESCUE CIRCLE (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Louise Cresser | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Lesley Anne Marlow | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
Heather Weaver-Allen | Trustee | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
TERANCE RAYMOND HADLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
HEATHER CASTLE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.14k | £125.60k | £55.22k | £69.25k | £98.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £122.24k | £93.64k | £62.90k | £122.65k | £78.16k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £21.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 11 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 November 2023 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 11 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 10 December 2020 | 40 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AND RULES ADOPTED 27TH SEPTEMBER 1979 AMENDED 2 DECEMBER 2003.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE SOCIETY ARE TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING OF ANIMALS WHICH ARE IN NEED OF CARE BY REASON OF HOMELESSNESS, MALTREATMENT, ILL-USAGE OR SIMILAR CAUSES. TO RE-HOME SUCH ANIMALS IN AN ENVIRONMENT THAT IS SAFE AND CONDUCTIVE TO THEIR LEADING A FULL AND HAPPY LIFE. TO ENSURE THAT SUCH ANIMALS ARE NOT DESTROYED OTHER THAN ON THE RECOMMENDATION AND ADVICE OF A VETERINARY SURGEON DUE TO THE ANIMAL SUFFERING FROM AN INCURABLE CONDITION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE SIDMOUTH AND DISTRICT)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Animal Rescue Centre
Chineway Road
OTTERY ST. MARY
Devon
EX11 1PL
- Phone:
- 01404815487
- Email:
- arcrescue@gmail.com
- Website:
-
arcrescue.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window